Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11767980 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2022136702 | 05.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088074 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3136970 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | C | CA3136970 | 03.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088074 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021254659 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088074 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4000481 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088074 | 03.11.2020 |