Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
05.01.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.11.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
02.11.2021 | Change - representative |