EP4174568 - HOLLOW-CORE PHOTONIC CRYSTAL FIBER BASED BROADBAND RADIATION GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUERSCHMIDT, Sebastian, Thomas 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
GÖTZ, Peter, Maximilian 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
UEBEL, Patrick, Sebastian 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21205790.5 | 01.11.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174568 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/365, G02B6/02 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G02F1/365 (EP,IL,KR);
G02B6/02314 (EP,IL,KR);
G02B6/02328 (EP,IL,KR);
G02F1/3528 (EP,IL,KR);
G03F7/70616 (EP,IL,KR);
G03F9/7065 (EP,IL,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREITBANDSTRAHLUNGSGENERATOR MIT HOHLKERN AUF DER BASIS VON PHOTONISCHEN KRISTALLFASERN | [2023/18] | English: | HOLLOW-CORE PHOTONIC CRYSTAL FIBER BASED BROADBAND RADIATION GENERATOR | [2023/18] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE RAYONNEMENT À LARGE BANDE BASÉ SUR UNE FIBRE DE CRISTAL PHOTONIQUE À ÂME CREUSE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2004015085 | US6952253 | US6961116 | EP1628164 | US7265364 | US7646471 | US2010233600 | US2010328655 | US2011026032 | WO2011012624 | US2011102753 | US2011249244 | US2012044470 | US2015261097 | US9160137 | US2016161863 | WO2016102127 | US2016370717 | WO2017032454 | WO2018127266 | US20080451599 | US20080256780 | US20090920968 | US20090922587 | US20090486449 | US20100708678 |