EP3992038 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING AN ESSENTIAL COMPONENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUF Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Str. 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trischberger, Werner 85229 Langenpettenbach Markt Indersdorf / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21206143.6 | 03.11.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | DE202010128901 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020128901 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992038 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/0215 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B60R25/02153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPERREN UND FREIGEBEN EINES FUNKTIONSWESENTLICHEN BAUTEILS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2022/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING AN ESSENTIAL COMPONENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE ET DÉBLOCAGE D'UN COMPOSANT ESSENTIEL AU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 04.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2070781 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3392095 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]WO2018206546 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) |