EP3992169 - COLOURED TECHNICAL CORUNDUM CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polycrystal design GmbH Ostra-Allee 27 01067 Dresden / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klimke, Herrn Dr.rer.nat. Jens 01309 Dresden / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Sperling, Thomas Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Tolkewitzer Straße 22 01277 Dresden / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21206158.4 | 03.11.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | DE202010128886 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020128886 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992169 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/115, C04B35/64, C04B41/85 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
C04B35/115 (EP);
C04B35/64 (EP);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/5009 (EP);
C04B41/85 (EP);
C04B2111/00836 (EP);
C04B2111/82 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3227 (EP);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3239 (EP);
C04B2235/3241 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/3262 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (EP);
C04B2235/3279 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/5454 (EP);
C04B2235/602 (EP);
C04B2235/6023 (EP);
C04B2235/6027 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (EP);
C04B2235/661 (EP);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/9661 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (EP);
C04B41/5009, C04B41/4535, C04B41/4578, C04B2103/0013, C04B2103/0018 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄRBTE TECHNISCHE KORUND-KERAMIK UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2022/18] | English: | COLOURED TECHNICAL CORUNDUM CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2022/18] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE À CORINDON TECHNIQUE COLORÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 03.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2012304 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* examples 1, 2 *; | [XA]US4699774 (PRUD HOMME VAN REINE PETER R [NL], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * Ansprüche; Beispiel; Tabelle * [A] 2,3,7,9-15; | [XA]JPH04193760 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1,8 * example 1; table 1 * [A] 2-7,9-15; | [ID]EP1706365 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [ID] 1-15 * das ganze Dokument - siehe die Beispiele *; | [XA] - MASAAKI NAGASHIMA ET AL, "Fabrication and optical characterization of high-density Al2O3 doped with slight MnO dopant", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (20080101), vol. 116, no. 1353, doi:10.2109/jcersj2.116.645, ISSN 1882-0743, pages 645 - 648, XP055056844 [X] 1,8 * "2. Experimental Procedure"; Abbildungen 1, 2 und 5 * [A] 2-7,9-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2109/jcersj2.116.645 | by applicant | US4894194 | US5028362 | US5145908 | EP1706365 | WO2011120181 | EP2239246 | US9434654 | - ALUMINA, J. AmCeram Soc., vol. 89, no. 6, pages 1985 - 1992 | - A.C. YOUNGO.O. OMATETEM.A. JANNEYP.A. MENCHHOFER, "Gelcasting of Alumina", J. Am. Ceram. Soc., (19910000), vol. 74, no. 3, pages 612 - 18 |