EP4177231 - THERMAL INSULATION SYSTEMS WITH IMPROVED COST EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUMRICH, Uwe 64846 Groß-Zimmern / DE | 02 /
GERHARZ-KALTE, Bettina 65597 Hünfelden / DE | 03 /
GRÖGER, Martin 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | 04 /
GÄRTNER, Gabriele 61130 Nidderau / DE | 05 /
MENZEL, Frank 63456 Hanau / DE | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21206186.5 | 03.11.2021 | [2023/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177231 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/12, // C04B111/28 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C04B28/12 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/12, C04B7/02, C04B14/064, C04B14/185, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/42, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEDÄMMSYSTEME MIT VERBESSERTER KOSTENEFFIZIENZ | [2023/19] | English: | THERMAL INSULATION SYSTEMS WITH IMPROVED COST EFFICIENCY | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE À RAPPORT COÛT-EFFICACITÉ AMÉLIORÉ | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1988228 (RIMMELE MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1* claims 2,5 *; | [A]WO2014090790 (EMPA EIDGENÖSSISCHE MATERIALPRÜFUNGS UND FORSCHUNGSANSTALT [CH], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 12 - line 20 *; | [A]CH708687 (ADT AERO DÄMM TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 6 *; | [AD]WO2015090615 (INTERBRAN SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 32, line 4 - line 21 *; | [A]CN105819781 (LI CHUNSONG) [A] 1 * claim 3 *; | [XA]FR3055132 (LISBONIS CHAUX GRASSES L C G [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * claims 1-19 * * page 1, line 5 - line 11 * * page 2, line 9 - line 22 * * page 4, line 20 - line 29 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 23 * [A] 5,7,9,10; | [A]CN107740507 (JIANGSU LYUYUE INSULATION MAT CO LTD) [A] 1 * claim 3 *; | [A]CN108529990 (SHENZHEN JIADA HIGH TECH IND DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1 * example 1 * | by applicant | WO2015014813 | WO2015090615 |