Extract from the Register for Unitary Patent Protection

UP About this file: EP4177110  C0

EP4177110 - A FOLDABLE FRONT STEP AND A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusUnitary effect registered
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for unitary effect filed
Status updated on  05.11.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2025New entry: Payment of renewal fee 
Proprietor(s)For all participating member states
VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2024/51]  
Inventor(s)01 / BERGQVIST, Hans
423 53 Torslanda / SE
 [2023/19]
Representative(s)Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 2096
403 12 Göteborg / SE
[2025/07]
Former [2024/51]Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date21206261.603.11.2021
[2023/19]
Procedural languageEN
(Principal) place of business   Tooltip
on the date of filing
 Principal place of businessTooltip
Unitary Patent Protection05.11.2024Date of request for unitary effect [2024/50]
13.11.2024Decision on the request for unitary effect:  Positive [2024/51]
13.11.2024Date of registration  [2024/51]
09.10.2024Date of legal effect  [2024/51]
Member States covered by Unitary  Tooltip
Patent Protection
13.11.2024AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI  [2024/51]
PublicationType: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4177110
Date:09.10.2024
Language:EN
[2024/41]
Renewal fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2025Renewal fee unitary effect year  04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee  04
30.11.2024M06  Fee paid on  21.02.2025
The European Patent Register provides the information on unitary patent protection required under R. 16(1) UPR. "Status" and "Most recent event" are not entries required under R. 16(1) UPR and should therefore be regarded as additional information only.

The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes. Please refer to the relevant national patent authority for SPC data.