Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023002323 | ![]() | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514833222 | 24.08.2015 | US202217589118 | 31.01.2022 | US201916352705 | 13.03.2019 | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | US202016921273 | 06.07.2020 | US201715692255 | 31.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9776969 | ![]() | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2015361043 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514833222 | 24.08.2015 | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9145366 | ![]() | 29.09.2015 | B2 | US2012309977 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11267785 | ![]() | 08.03.2022 | B2 | US2021122715 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514833222 | 24.08.2015 | US201916352705 | 13.03.2019 | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | US201715692255 | 31.08.2017 | US202016921273 | 06.07.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10738010 | ![]() | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2019375713 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514833222 | 24.08.2015 | US201916352705 | 13.03.2019 | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | US201715692255 | 31.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10246416 | ![]() | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2017362178 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514833222 | 24.08.2015 | US201213488554 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | US201715692255 | 31.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102293016B | ![]() | 26.08.2021 | B1 | KR20200121911 | 26.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | KR20197037296 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102171315B | ![]() | 28.10.2020 | B1 | KR20190141805 | 24.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102059366B | ![]() | 26.12.2019 | B1 | KR20190031593 | 26.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102032864B | ![]() | 16.10.2019 | B1 | KR20190032617 | 27.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102000485B | ![]() | 16.07.2019 | B1 | KR20140037192 | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023103414 | ![]() | 26.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | JP2022035813 | 09.03.2022 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7284309B | ![]() | 30.05.2023 | B2 | JP2022081597 | 31.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020213442 | 23.12.2020 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6290781B | ![]() | 07.03.2018 | B2 | JP2014522409 | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL229775 | ![]() | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3683209 | ![]() | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3683209 | 22.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3290404 | ![]() | 11.12.2019 | B1 | EP3290404 | 07.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3000808 | ![]() | 27.09.2017 | B1 | EP3000808 | 30.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2718265 | ![]() | 16.12.2015 | B1 | EP2718265 | 19.11.2014 | A4 | EP2718265 | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106518759B | ![]() | 30.07.2019 | B | CN106518759 | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280038564 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103717575 | ![]() | 09.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2838194 | ![]() | 11.01.2022 | C | CA2838194 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020204528B | ![]() | 14.07.2022 | B2 | AU2020204528 | 30.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012268426 | 05.06.2012 | AU2020204528 | 07.07.2020 | AU2018250355 | 15.10.2018 | AU2017202414 | 12.04.2017 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018250355B | ![]() | 09.04.2020 | B2 | AU2018250355 | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012268426 | 05.06.2012 | AU2018250355 | 15.10.2018 | AU2017202414 | 12.04.2017 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017202414B | ![]() | 19.07.2018 | B2 | AU2017202414 | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012268426 | 05.06.2012 | AU2017202414 | 12.04.2017 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012268426B | ![]() | 16.02.2017 | B2 | AU2012268426 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4026829 | ![]() | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | EP19214405 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3135440 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2838194 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1117177T | 05.04.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119605T | 04.04.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1122639T | 12.03.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1124874T | 25.11.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2718265T | 25.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3000808T | 27.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3290404T | 17.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3683209T | 06.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2559850T | 16.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1196616 | 19.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20151416T | 25.03.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20171740T | 09.03.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20200197T | 15.05.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20211916T | 18.03.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP19214405 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337216 | 18.02.2016 | B | MX2013014228 | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX347709 | 10.05.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ618570 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2718265T | 29.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3000808T | 30.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3290404T | 01.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3683209T | 21.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | EP19214405 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS54517 | 30.06.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS56580 | 28.02.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS59902 | 31.03.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2602083 | 10.11.2016 | C2 | RU2013158640 | 20.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2718265T | 31.03.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12796374 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3000808T | 28.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3290404T | 31.03.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3683209T | 31.03.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP19214405 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201600013B | 25.02.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | WO2012US40833 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201700534T | 11.01.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15189822 | 05.06.2012 | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202000061T | 13.03.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | EP17191362 | 05.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012170377 | ![]() | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7039682B | ![]() | 22.03.2022 | B2 | JP2021059573 | 15.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6816195B | ![]() | 20.01.2021 | B2 | JP2019123741 | 25.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6510094B | ![]() | 08.05.2019 | B2 | JP2018111697 | 19.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2647602T | 22.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2771232T | 06.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2900572T | 17.03.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1216173 | 21.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1252109 | 17.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026096T | 30.05.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE034975T | 02.05.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE048044T | 28.05.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE057571T | 28.05.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3000808T | 25.01.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3290404T | 25.02.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3683209T | 10.01.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2686520T | 17.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2718265E | 15.02.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3000808T | 23.11.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3290404T | 19.02.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3683209T | 15.12.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2764667 | 19.01.2022 | C2 | RU2016139352 | 27.01.2020 | A3 | RU2016139352 | 13.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493536 | 06.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP2718265 | EP3000808 | EP3290404 | EP3683209 |