EP3995677 - CONTROL DEVICE OF AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, METHOD OF CONTROLLING AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDO, Takato Nagakute-shi, 480-1192 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Matsuei Nagakute-shi, 480-1192 / JP | 03 /
INAGAKI, Hideto Nagakute-shi, 480-1192 / JP | 04 /
MASUI, Kento Kariya-shi, 448-8671 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Junichi Kariya-shi, 448-8671 / JP | 06 /
KONDO, Kazuya Kariya-shi, 448-8671 / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21206487.7 | 04.11.2021 | [2022/19] | Priority number, date | JP20200185790 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020185790 | JP20210165891 | 08.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021165891 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995677 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N9/00, F01N13/00, F01N3/10 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N13/0093 (EP);
F01N3/101 (EP);
F01N9/005 (EP);
F01N2430/06 (EP);
F01N2560/021 (EP);
F01N2560/023 (EP);
F01N2560/026 (EP);
F01N2610/03 (EP);
F01N2900/08 (EP);
F01N2900/1402 (EP);
F01N2900/1614 (EP);
F01N2900/1616 (EP);
F01N2900/1621 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES NACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEMS, NACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES NACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEMS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2022/19] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE OF AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, METHOD OF CONTROLLING AFTER-TREATMENT SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2022/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE POST-TRAITEMENT, SYSTÈME DE POST-TRAITEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE POST-TRAITEMENT, ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE112013004471T (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-2; claims 1-6 *; | [X]DE102016102436 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9* figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2018274419 (SAKUMA TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2003328732 | US8230677 | JP2015081602 | JP2020504260 |