EP3967737 - COMPOSITIONS, SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR INTRODUCING PAG LUBRICANT OR REFRIGERANT INTO AN AIR-CONDITIONING OR SYSTEM USING LOWER OR LOW GWP REFRIGERANT OR REFRIGERANT BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAN, Mary E. Chadds Ford, 19317 / US | 02 /
GRAY, Nina E. Philadelphia, 19118 / US | 03 /
MENTZ JR., Hubert Perryville, 21903 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21206639.3 | 19.12.2018 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US201862620568P | 23.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862620568 P | US201862745447P | 14.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745447 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967737 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, F25B45/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,KR);
C10M171/008 (CN,KR);
C10M107/34 (US);
B60H1/00 (CN);
B60H1/00585 (KR,US);
C09K5/041 (CN,US);
C10M169/04 (US);
F25B31/002 (KR);
F25B45/00 (EP,KR);
C09K2205/126 (EP,KR);
C10M2207/2835 (KR);
C10M2209/1033 (US);
C10M2227/04 (US);
C10M2229/02 (US);
C10M2229/041 (KR);
C10M2229/042 (KR);
C10N2020/097 (KR);
C10N2020/101 (KR);
C10N2030/08 (US);
C10N2030/70 (KR);
C10N2040/30 (KR,US);
F25B2345/001 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN VON PAG-SCHMIERMITTEL ODER KÄLTEMITTEL IN EINE KLIMAANLAGE ODER EIN SYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KÜHL- ODER KÜHLMITTELMISCHUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGEM GWP | [2022/11] | English: | COMPOSITIONS, SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR INTRODUCING PAG LUBRICANT OR REFRIGERANT INTO AN AIR-CONDITIONING OR SYSTEM USING LOWER OR LOW GWP REFRIGERANT OR REFRIGERANT BLENDS | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTRODUCTION D'UN LUBRIFIANT OU D'UN RÉFRIGÉRANT PAG DANS UN CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR OU SYSTÈME UTILISANT DES MÉLANGES RÉFRIGÉRANTS OU DES RÉFRIGÉRANTS À PRP FAIBLE OU RÉDUIT | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18833586.3 / EP3743481 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009241562 (THOMAS RAYMOND H [US], et al); | [XDI]US2011272624 (SERRANO MYRNA [US], et al); | [XI]US2016068731 (MINOR BARBARA HAVILAND [US], et al); | by applicant | US4755316 | US5152926 | US5976399 | CA2557873 | US2006116310 | US2007187639 | US2007289317 | US2007290164 | WO2008027595 | WO2009018117 | US20050575256 | US20080250219 |