EP4177484 - FASTENER FOR JOINING PARTS AND JOINT FORMED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus (S.A.S.) 2, Rond Point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrles, Christian 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | KASTEL Patentanwälte PartG mbB St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21206964.5 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177484 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B35/06 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
F16B35/06 (EP);
F16B37/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUM VERBINDEN VON TEILEN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE VERBINDUNG | [2023/19] | English: | FASTENER FOR JOINING PARTS AND JOINT FORMED THEREWITH | [2023/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE DE PIÈCES ET ASSEMBLAGE AINSI FORMÉ | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6302630 (GRANT WILLIAM S [US]); | [X]US2010196119 (MIYAGAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US8651413 (KASHIWAGI MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XAI]EP3108149 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [X]EP3283304 (ELLEDI S R L [IT]); | [X]CN108953343 (YAN ZHENHONG); | [X]CN111306170 (HUAEN POWER TECH CO LTD) |