blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3973768

EP3973768 - LIGHTING SYSTEM CONTROLLING ULTRAVIOLET INTENSITY OVER A SURFACE OF A LIGHT SENSITIVE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.03.2025
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.09.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.02.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2025(Expected) grantpublished on 16.04.2025  [2025/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seoul Viosys Co. Ltd.
65-16, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR
For all designated states
Sensor Electronic Technology, Inc.
110 Atlas Court
Columbia, SC 29209 / US
[2022/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BARBER, Arthur Peter, III.
Columbia, South Carolina 29212 / US
02 / SHATALOV, Maxim S.
Columbia, South Carolina 29209 / US
03 / DOBRINSKY, Alexander
Silver Spring, Maryland 20901 / US
04 / SHUR, Michael
Vienna, Virginia 22181 / US
 [2022/13]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2022/13]
Application number, filing date21207179.928.09.2017
[2022/13]
Priority number, dateUS201662403003P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662403003 P
US20171571129121.09.2017         Original published format: US201715711291
[2022/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3973768
Date:30.03.2022
Language:EN
[2022/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3973768
Date:16.04.2025
Language:EN
[2025/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2022
ClassificationIPC:A01G7/04, G06Q50/02, H05B45/10, H05B47/105, H05B31/50, H05B45/20, H05B47/115, H05B47/11
[2024/46]
CPC:
A01G7/045 (EP,US); A01G9/20 (US); A23B2/53 (US);
A23B7/015 (US); G01J1/0228 (US); G01J1/10 (US);
G01J1/16 (US); G01J1/20 (US); G01J1/24 (US);
G01J1/26 (US); G01J1/42 (US); G01J1/429 (US);
G01N21/6486 (US); H05B45/10 (US); H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B47/11 (EP); H05B47/115 (US); H05B47/16 (US);
G01J2001/1657 (US); G01J2001/4252 (US); Y02B20/40 (EP);
Y02P60/14 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2022/13]A01G7/04, G06Q50/02, H05B45/10, H05B47/105, H05B31/50, H05B45/20, H05B47/115
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/44]
Former [2022/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT STEUERUNG DER UV-INTENSITÄT ÜBER EINE OBERFLÄCHE EINES LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN KÖRPERS[2022/13]
English:LIGHTING SYSTEM CONTROLLING ULTRAVIOLET INTENSITY OVER A SURFACE OF A LIGHT SENSITIVE OBJECT[2022/13]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE AVEC RÉGULATION DE L'INTENSITÉ DES ULTRAVIOLETS SUR UNE SURFACE D'UN OBJET SENSIBLE À LA LUMIÈRE[2022/13]
Examination procedure29.09.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2022Examination requested  [2022/44]
29.09.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2025Fee for grant paid
10.03.2025Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.03.2025Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17856771.5  / EP3518651
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010115830  (DUBE SYLVAIN [SE]);
 [I]US2010193707  (YAMADA MAKOTO [JP], et al);
 [IY]WO2015119510  (BIOLUMIC LTD [NZ])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.