EP4092791 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF COOLANT IN FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd. 203, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06141 / KR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Sung Kyung 16891 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
WON, Jong Bo 16891 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21207217.7 | 09.11.2021 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | KR20210065745 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210065745 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092791 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4092791 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04029, H01M8/0432, H01M8/04746 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H01M8/04029 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M8/04723 (KR);
H01M8/04014 (CN,KR);
H01M8/04067 (CN);
H01M8/0432 (KR);
H01M8/04358 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04417 (US);
H01M8/04768 (EP);
H01M8/04947 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DER KÜHLMITTELTEMPERATUR IN EINEM BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2022/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF COOLANT IN FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2022/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RÉGLER LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UN RÉFRIGÉRANT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016141679 (YAMADA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 9-13 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 49]; figures 2, 3 *; | [I]JP2016134337 (DENSO CORP, et al) [I] 9-13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027]; figure 1 *; | [IY]US2019165395 (FOLICK DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0164] - [0186]; figures 2,13 * [Y] 8; | [Y]CN111439167 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [Y] 8* figure 1 * |