EP3968543 - SATELLITE COMMUNICATION TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST Engineering iDirect (Europe) Cy NV Laarstraat 5 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Bie, Ulrik 9120 Haasdonk / BE | 02 /
Breynaert, Dirk 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | 03 /
Christopoulos, Dimitrios 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Winger Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2023/48] |
Former [2022/11] | DenK iP bv Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 21207666.5 | 02.07.2019 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US201862712295P | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862712295 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968543 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3968543 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, // H04W72/044 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H04B7/18591 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
H04B7/088 (CN,IL,RU,US);
H04B7/18513 (CN,IL,RU,US);
H04B7/0695 (CN);
H04B7/18517 (EP,CN,IL);
H04B7/18582 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | H04B7/185, // H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SATELLITENKOMMUNIKATIONSSENDER | [2022/11] | English: | SATELLITE COMMUNICATION TRANSMITTER | [2022/11] | French: | ÉMETTEUR DE COMMUNICATION PAR SATELLITE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 12.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19739945.4 / EP3830978 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008097367 (VIASAT INC [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0070] - [0079] *; | [A]FR3049792 (SPACE SYSTEMS/LORAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * pages 40-42; figures 26-28 *; | [A]WO2018092132 (SATIXFY ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [A] 1 * pages 20-25 * * pages 37-43 *; | [A]US10033509 (RAINISH DORON [IL]) [A] 1 * columns 19,20 * | by applicant | WO2014091271 | EP20180176340 |