EP4054078 - BIPOLAR PULSED-VOLTAGE GATE DRIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AES Global Holdings, Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng, 05-07 Singapore 539775 / SG | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Robert Denver / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Bartholomew, Anna, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21207714.3 | 11.11.2021 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US202117192177 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: US202117192177 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054078 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/691, H03K5/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H03K17/691 (EP);
H02M1/088 (CN);
H03K17/6871 (US);
H02M3/33576 (CN);
H03K2217/0063 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0072 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIPOLARER PULSSPANNUNGS-GATE-TREIBER | [2022/36] | English: | BIPOLAR PULSED-VOLTAGE GATE DRIVER | [2022/36] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE GRILLE BIPOLAIRE À TENSION PULSÉE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL, SI, SE, RS, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE10027088 (KLEMT MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2-6 * [A] 9-13; | [XAI]WO2009008739 (POWER CONCEPTS NZ LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,3-8 * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 19; figure 3 * [A] 9-13 [I] 2; | [XA]WO2016159948 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 9-13 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3-7 *[A] 1-8 |