EP4180888 - METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING A PRODUCTION LINE STANDSTILL TIME FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klos, Hans-Henning 91249 Weigendorf / DE | 02 /
Gross, Ralf 90471 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Kohler, Benjamin 90408 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
Lavrik, Vladimir 63303 Dreieich / DE | 05 /
Riedl, Wolfgang 90408 Nürnberg / DE | 06 /
Schnittger, Jens 91475 Lonnerstadt / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21207808.3 | 11.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180888 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06N20/00 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G05B23/0283 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VORHERSAGE EINER PRODUKTIONSLINIENSTILLSTANDSZEIT FÜR EINE INDUSTRIELLE AUTOMATISIERUNGSANORDNUNG | [2023/20] | English: | METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING A PRODUCTION LINE STANDSTILL TIME FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION ARRANGEMENT | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES POUR LA PRÉDICTION DU TEMPS D'ARRÊT D'UNE LIGNE DE PRODUCTION POUR UN AGENCEMENT D'AUTOMATISATION INDUSTRIELLE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3223095 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0008] - [0018] - [0024] - [0035]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2021080941 (ENTZMINGER ROB A [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0015] - [0046] - [0053]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2021158220 (LAVID BEN LULU DAVID [IL], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0008] - [0012] - [0014] - [0023] - [0039] - [0045] - [0072]; figures 1,4-6 * | by applicant | WO2021EP71128 |