EP3988922 - HIGH PERFORMANCE FLUORESCENCE IMAGING MODULE FOR GENOMIC TESTING ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Biosciences, Inc. 10055 Barnes Canyon Road San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/16] |
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states Element Biosciences, Inc. 9880 Campus Point Drive, Suite 210 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Steven Xiangling San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
GUO, Minghao San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
PREVITE, Michael San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Chunhong San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
FULLER, Derek San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/17] | 01 /
CHEN, Steven Xiangling San Diego, 92121 / US | ||
02 /
GUO, Minghao San Diego, 92121 / US | |||
03 /
PREVITE, Michael San Diego, 92121 / US | |||
04 /
ZHOU, Chunhong San Diego, 92121 / US | |||
05 /
FULLER, Derek San Diego, 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21207850.5 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | US202062962723P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962723 P | US202063076361P | 09.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076361 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988922 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3988922 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, C12Q1/6869, G01N15/10, G06V20/69, C12Q1/6874 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G01N15/1484 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
G01N15/1436 (IL,KR,US);
G01N21/6486 (GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/1006 (IL,US);
C12Q1/6806 (IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,IL);
G01N15/147 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/6402 (IL,KR,US);
G01N21/6428 (IL,KR,US);
G01N21/6456 (GB,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/6458 (CN,IL,KR,US);
G06V20/69 (EP,GB,IL);
C12Q2563/107 (IL,KR);
G01N2015/1006 (EP,CN,IL);
G01N2015/144 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G01N2021/6439 (IL,US);
G01N2021/6441 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2563/107 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | G01N15/14, G06V20/69, G01N15/10, C12Q1/6869 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2022/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2022/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSFLUORESZENZBILDGEBUNGSMODUL FÜR GENOMISCHES TESTASSAY | [2022/17] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE FLUORESCENCE IMAGING MODULE FOR GENOMIC TESTING ASSAY | [2022/17] | French: | MODULE D'IMAGERIE PAR FLUORESCENCE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE POUR ESSAI DE TEST GÉNOMIQUE | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21741308.7 / EP3942039 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2009272914 (FENG WENYI [US], et al); | [YA]US2015160450 (OU XIAOZE [US], et al) | by applicant | US5512131 | US2020139375 | US10655176 | WO2020118255 | US2020218052 | US10768173 |