EP4181253 - FUEL CELL POWER PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greengt SA EPFL Innovation Park/Bâtiment A 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUREAU, Eric 74500 EVIAN-LES-BAINS / FR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21207928.9 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181253 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/2465, B60K1/00, H01M8/2475, H01M8/248, H01M8/249, // H01M8/10 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H01M8/2475 (EP);
H01M8/249 (EP,US);
B60K1/00 (EP);
B60K1/04 (EP);
H01M8/2404 (US);
H01M8/2457 (US);
H01M8/2465 (EP);
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENBLOCK | [2023/20] | English: | FUEL CELL POWER PACK | [2023/20] | French: | BLOC-PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 31.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2013152878 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraph [0041]; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,7,9 [Y] 6,8; | [XY]US2016121752 (TAKEYAMA MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0027]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 3,4,6,8; | [Y]DE102018208673 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6,8* paragraphs [0038] - [0049]; figure 3 *; | [Y]CN113571751 (WEISHI ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * figures 1,5 * | by applicant | EP2210757 |