EP4180282 - BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/20] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PESCHEL, Michael 82296 Schöngeising / DE | 02 /
BLESSING, Michael 80687 München / DE | 03 /
ADAMCZYK, Philipp 82347 Bernried / DE | 04 /
KLINGNER, Matthias 82275 Emmering / DE | 05 /
KRÜGER, Sven Philip 81476 München / DE | 06 /
SCHALLER, Sebastian 86462 Langweid / DE | 07 /
HÖS, Levente 1047 Budapest / HU | 08 /
GYÖRKE, Zsombor 8360 Keszthely / HU | 09 /
SZABO, Janos 1101 Budapest / HU | 10 /
MONORI, Gyula 6065 Lakitelek / UG | 11 /
MLINARCSEK, Csaba 1165 Budapest / HU | 12 /
KOKREHEL, Csaba 1119 Budapest / HU | 13 /
HEIGL, Korbinian 85652 Pliening / DE | 14 /
TOTH, Janos 6000 Kecskemét / HU | 15 /
SCHÖFBERGER, Tobias 84048 Mainburg / DE | 16 /
NAKAMURA, Tatsuro 1027 Budapest / HU | 17 /
HOLLOSI, Mate 1097 Budapest / HU | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21208091.5 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180282 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/06, B60T11/10, B60T13/26, B60T13/36, B60T17/08, F16D55/00, F16D55/10, F16D55/18, F16D55/22, F16D55/224, F16D55/225, F16D55/2255, F16D55/228, F16D55/31, F16D55/32, F16D55/33 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
F16D65/186 (EP);
F16D55/46 (EP);
F16D2121/04 (EP);
F16D2121/08 (EP);
F16D2121/24 (EP);
F16D2125/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSANLAGE UND FAHRZEUG MIT SOLCH EINER BREMSANLAGE | [2023/20] | English: | BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH BRAKE ASSEMBLY | [2023/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE FREIN ET VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN TEL ENSEMBLE FREIN | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/19] | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9806608 (KELSEY HAYES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-12,15,16 * figures 1, 2, 3 * [I] 3,5,8,13,14; | [X]EP1348882 (ARVINMERITOR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004188189 (BAUMGARTNER JOHANN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202007019600U (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2971838 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]DE202017002779U (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3431353 (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEMS UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019329754 (RAVEENDRAPPA DHANANJAYA [IN], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |