EP3978062 - ASPIRATED WOUND DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConvaTec Technologies Inc. 3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 250 Las Vegas NV 89169 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Mingliang Lawrence Las Vegas, 89169 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 21208166.5 | 12.01.2010 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | US20090144885P | 15.01.2009 Original published format: US 144885 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978062 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00, A61M1/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61M1/74 (EP,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,US);
A61M1/966 (EP,US);
A61M1/964 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABGESAUGTER WUNDVERBAND | [2022/14] | English: | ASPIRATED WOUND DRESSING | [2022/14] | French: | PANSEMENT POUR PLAIE SOUS ASPIRATION | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10731988.1 / EP2387432 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008077091 (MULLIGAN SHARON [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs 0019, 0021, 0025, 0034; figures 1, 3 *; | [X]EP1905465 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-7* paragraphs 0024, 0028; figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | US3948098 | US3960007 | US4354180 | US4969880 | US5576619 | US5678564 | US2006100594 |