EP4020354 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC LOGGING OF A CARGO TRANSFER IN AN ELECTRONIC CARGO DOCUMENT SYSTEM, LOGGING DEVICE AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2022/26] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketterer, Timo 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Bertl, Svenja 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 21208223.4 | 15.11.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | DE202010216510 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020216510 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020354 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06Q10/083 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN PROTOKOLLIERUNG EINER FRACHTÜBERGABE IN EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN FRACHTPAPIERSYSTEM, PROTOKOLLEINRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUG | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC LOGGING OF A CARGO TRANSFER IN AN ELECTRONIC CARGO DOCUMENT SYSTEM, LOGGING DEVICE AND VEHICLE | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'UNE REMISE DE FRET DANS UN SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PAPIER DE FRET, DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT ET VÉHICULE | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102017204535 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [XY]CN111667218 (ZIBO VOCATIONAL INST); | [Y]CN111724108 (JIANGSU XIYOU INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) |