EP4052892 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TYRE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Str. 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komischke, Ralf 30165 Hannover / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21208297.8 | 15.11.2021 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | DE202110202112 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021202112 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4052892 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4052892 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4052892 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/02, B29D30/08, B29D30/70, // B29D30/06 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B29D30/02 (EP);
B29D30/08 (EP);
B29D30/70 (EP);
B29D2030/0683 (EP);
B29D2030/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FAHRZEUGREIFENS | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TYRE FOR A VEHICLE | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PNEU DE VÉHICULE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN104648053 (WUHAN SCORPIO CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1 * WPI und EPODOC Zusammenfassungen;; figure 1; claims 1-3 *[I] 2-12; | [XI]EP3385094 (KUMHO TIRE CO INC [KR]) [X] 1,2 * WPI Zusammenfassung; paragraphs [0029] - [0061]; figures 1-9 * [I] 3-12; | [XI]EP3482972 (ADVANTARIA SL [ES]) [X] 1,2 * WPI und EPODOC Zusammenfassungen; paragraphs [0042] - [0057]; figures 1-7 * [I] 3-12 |