EP4009557 - METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORSNER, Johan 02400 KYRKSLÄTT / FI | 02 /
ASTELY, David 16856 BROMMA / SE | 03 /
PARKVALL, Stefan 16757 BROMMA / SE | 04 /
TYNDERFELDT, Tobias Morristown, New Jersey, 07960 / US | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Schwarz, Markku Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21208442.0 | 03.04.2008 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | SE20070000902 | 11.04.2007 Original published format: SE 0700902 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4009557 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1621 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08724332.5 / EP2145418 | EP16156862.1 / EP3110060 | EP18171634.1 / EP3382924 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0139433 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 9 * * claims 1-10 *; | [XA]WO2005119959 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 8 * * page 10, line 31 - page 15, line 9 * * figures 1A,1B * [A] 2-12; | [A]US2006048034 (CHO KYUNG-IK [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]US7139251 (VARMA SUBIR [US]) [A] 1-15* claim 1 * |