EP4180720 - GAS BURNER ARRANGEMENT, WORK SURFACE ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS BURNER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beliveau, Thomas Eric 80798 München / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Tobias 82211 Herrsching / DE | 03 /
Schumacher, Frank 80337 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21208459.4 | 16.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180720 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/08 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
F24C3/085 (EP,CN);
F23D14/46 (CN);
F23D14/60 (CN);
F24C15/08 (CN);
F24C15/10 (CN);
F24C15/2035 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASBRENNERANORDNUNG, ARBEITSFLÄCHENANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER GASBRENNERANORDNUNG | [2023/20] | English: | GAS BURNER ARRANGEMENT, WORK SURFACE ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS BURNER ARRANGEMENT | [2023/20] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BRÛLEUR À GAZ, AGENCEMENT DE SURFACE DE TRAVAIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN AGENCEMENT DE BRÛLEUR À GAZ | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 17.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2566440 (BEYNON JOHN K) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]US2007145032 (GRAHAM LINDSAY G [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]JP2014178111 (RINNAI KK, et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-8 *; | [XI]JP5808185B (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,13 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1-14 * [I] 2,7,10,14; | [A]CN208186431U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | WO2020193301 |