Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.04.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
17.11.2021 | Change - representative |