EP4184022 - EXTENDIBLE MAGAZINE, FILLED MAGAZINE AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lukic, Sasha 9470 Buchs / CH | 02 /
Baumgartner, Gerard 6003 Luzern / CH | 03 /
Sprenger, Marius 9470 Buchs / CH | 04 /
Ziltener, Michael 8854 Siebnen / CH | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21208694.6 | 17.11.2021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184022 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B27/00 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
F16B27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERLÄNGERBARES MAGAZIN, BEFÜLLTES MAGAZIN SOWIE VERWENDUNG | [2023/21] | English: | EXTENDIBLE MAGAZINE, FILLED MAGAZINE AND USE | [2023/21] | French: | MAGASIN EXTENSIBLE, MAGASIN REMPLI, AINSI QU'UTILISATION | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 24.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]AT384765B (SFS STADLER AG [CH]); | [XYI]WO2010000381 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR], et al); | [Y]US8544369 (PARK JEREMY SCOTT [US]); | [A]CN103511428B ; | [Y]EP3613544 (HILTI AG [LI]) | by applicant | DE10162635 |