EP4026898 - ENGINEERED PLATELETS FOR TARGETED DELIVERY OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JPV01 Ltd 21 Bedford Square London WC1B 3HH / GB | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATTERSON, James Cambridge, CB2 0NU / GB | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21208870.2 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | GB20190018586 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201918586 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026898 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/078, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K35/19, A61K39/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/19 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/461 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/46433 (KR);
A61K39/4644 (KR);
A61K39/464401 (KR);
A61K39/464412 (EP,IL);
A61P31/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/02 (KR);
C07K14/70535 (IL,US);
C07K14/70546 (IL,US);
C07K14/7056 (IL,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0644 (EP,IL,KR);
C12Y503/99005 (IL,US);
A61K2039/585 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/804 (EP,IL);
A61K2239/38 (KR);
A61K2239/48 (EP,IL);
A61K2239/57 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/30 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2319/33 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENTECHNISCH HERGESTELLTE PLÄTTCHEN ZUR GEZIELTEN ABGABE EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFS | [2022/28] | English: | ENGINEERED PLATELETS FOR TARGETED DELIVERY OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT | [2022/28] | French: | PLAQUETTES MODIFIÉES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION CIBLÉE D'UN AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 14.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20838179.8 / EP3947434 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2013151666 | WO2013176772 |