EP4015531 - MUTANT PORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies PLC Gosling Building Edmund Halley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4DQ / GB | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYASINGHE, Lakmal Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | 02 /
WALLACE, Elizabeth Jayne Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21209072.4 | 02.03.2017 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | GB20160003656 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603656 | GB20160003657 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603657 | GB20160003658 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603658 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4015531 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4015531 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, C12Q1/68, G01N33/483 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/245 (CN,KR,US);
G01N33/48721 (CN,KR,US);
C12Q2565/631 (KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/631 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MUTANTE PORE | [2022/25] | English: | MUTANT PORE | [2022/25] | French: | PORE MUTANT | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17710372.8 / EP3423486 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013153359 (OXFORD NANOPORE TECH LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US5576204 | WO0028312 | WO2005124888 | WO2006100484 | WO2008102120 | WO2008102121 | WO2009020682 | WO2009035647 | WO2009077734 | WO2010004273 | WO2010004265 | WO2010086603 | WO2010086602 | WO2010122293 | WO2011067559 | WO2012005857 | WO2013041878 | WO2013057495 | WO2013098562 | WO2013098561 | WO2013121224 | EP2682460 | WO2014013260 | WO2014013259 | WO2014013262 | WO1999US25679 | WO2006GB01057 | WO2008GB00562 | WO2008GB00563 | WO2008US10637 | WO2008GB04127 | WO2009GB01690 | WO2009GB01679 | EP20130187149 | WO2010GB00133 | WO2010GB00132 | WO2010GB00789 | WO2010GB02206 | WO2012GB52343 | WO2012GB52579 | WO2012GB53274 | WO2012GB53273 | WO2013GB50381 | WO2013GB51925 | WO2013GB51924 | WO2013GB51928 | WO2013GB52766 | WO2013GB52767 | WO2014GB50175 | GB20140003096 | GB20140006147 | GB20140006155 | WO2014GB52505 | WO2014GB52736 | WO2014GB52737 | GB20140018469 |