EP4008923 - CLUTCH WITH CENTRIFUGAL ASSEMBLY, ESPECIALLY FOR A MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endurance Adler S.p.A. Via G. Di Vittorio 20/22 38068 Rovereto (TN) / IT | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORONE, Alfio Ersilio 20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
MALDINI, Federico 40131 Bologna / IT | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/23] | Zelioli, Giovanni Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21209662.2 | 22.11.2021 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | IT20200029468 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: IT202000029468 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008923 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4008923 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/68, F16D13/12 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
F16D13/683 (EP);
F16D43/08 (CN);
F16D43/216 (EP,US);
F16D13/52 (US);
F16D43/12 (EP,CN);
F16D43/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG MIT FLIEHKRAFTANLAGE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN MOTORRAD | [2022/23] | English: | CLUTCH WITH CENTRIFUGAL ASSEMBLY, ESPECIALLY FOR A MOTORCYCLE | [2022/23] | French: | EMBRAYAGE AVEC ENSEMBLE CENTRIFUGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR MOTOCYCLETTE | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1087460 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1628027 (SHIGEMATSU CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0143]; figures 1-8 *; | [AD]EP2175154 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0095]; figures 3-15 *; | [AD]JP2012241804 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0061]; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE1087460 | GB995989 | EP2175154 | EP2400177 | JP2012241804 | WO2019101342 |