EP4184207 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINATION OF DIRECTION OF ARRIVAL ANGLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEKOOIJ, Marco Jan Gerrit Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOPPELAAR, Arie Geert Cornelis Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ALHASSON, Saif Eindhoven / NL | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21210013.5 | 23.11.2021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184207 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S7/40, // G01S13/931 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G01S7/4026 (EP);
G01S3/143 (CN);
G01S13/06 (US);
G01S13/42 (EP);
G01S13/68 (CN);
G01S3/32 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES EINFALLSWINKELS | [2023/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINATION OF DIRECTION OF ARRIVAL ANGLE | [2023/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA DIRECTION DE L'ANGLE D'ARRIVÉE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 24.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2020003333 (DENSO TEN LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0 18] - [0021] - [0 54] *; | [A] - SIM HEONKYO ET AL, "Improved DOA estimation method by distinction of different transmit signals in automotive MIMO frequency-modulated continuous wave radar systems", IET RADAR SONAR NAVIGATION, THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, UK, (20200801), vol. 14, no. 8, doi:10.1049/IET-RSN.2019.0634, ISSN 1751-8784, pages 1135 - 1142, XP006091485 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-rsn.2019.0634 | [A] - PENG CHEN ET AL, "Off-Grid DOA Estimation Using Sparse Bayesian Learning in MIMO Radar With Unknown Mutual Coupling", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180412), doi:10.1109/TSP.2018.2881663, XP081431859 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2018.2881663 |