blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4184270

EP4184270 - A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A DATA ASSOCIATED WITH ENERGY CONSUMPTION OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.11.2023
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2025New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2023/21]
Inventor(s)01 / LOMBARD, Benoit
38200 Villette-de-Vienne / FR
02 / ESTRAGNAT, Emmaneul
69003 SAINTE FOY LES LYON / FR
03 / LUNDSTRÖM, Jens
302 79 HOLM / SE
04 / QUELIN, Jerome
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
05 / STAHL, Adam
433 60 Sävedalen / SE
06 / ODEBO LÄNK, Nils
414 66 Göteborg / SE
07 / FRUCHARD, Nicolas
69003 Lyon / FR
08 / BERNASCONI, Regis
405 08 Göteborg / SE
09 / LUCHINI, Fabrice
405 08 Götebort / SE
10 / RODRIGUES, Gilbert
69800 Saint-Priest / FR
 [2023/21]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2023/21]
Application number, filing date21210072.123.11.2021
[2023/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4184270
Date:24.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2022
ClassificationIPC:G05B23/02
[2023/21]
CPC:
G05B23/024 (EP); B60W50/0097 (CN); G07C5/0816 (US);
G07C5/008 (US); G07C5/02 (US); G07C5/0808 (US);
B60L2260/54 (EP); B60W2050/0005 (CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/49]
Former [2023/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON MIT DEM ENERGIEVERBRAUCH EINES FAHRZEUGS VERBUNDENEN DATEN[2023/21]
English:A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A DATA ASSOCIATED WITH ENERGY CONSUMPTION OF A VEHICLE[2023/21]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DONNÉES ASSOCIÉES À LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'UN VÉHICULE[2023/21]
Examination procedure27.10.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2023Examination requested  [2023/49]
27.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202404   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US10192448  (MOREIRA-MATIAS LUIS [DE], et al);
 [Y]CN110070245  (JIQI IOT TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD);
 [XYI]US10464547  (PARK DAVID S [US], et al);
 [Y]KR20210061669  (KOREA HYDRO & NUCLEAR POWER CO [KR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.