EP4008543 - A COUNTER-PRESSURE ROLLER, AN ARRANGEMENT AND A METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACINI, Nicola 41122 Modena / IT | 02 /
COLLIVA, Nicola 40137 Bologna / IT | 03 /
COSTA, Stefano 26041 Casalmaggiore / IT | 04 /
LA NOTTE, Mario 41121 Modena / IT | 05 /
CREMONESE, Andrea 41124 Modena / IT | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 21210406.1 | 25.11.2021 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | EP20200210989 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20210989 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008543 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/64, B29C65/00 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
B31B50/64 (EP);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/5042 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/346 (EP);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/72328 (EP);
B29C66/81419 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/81465 (EP,US);
B65B51/16 (EP,US);
B65B51/26 (EP,US);
B31B2100/0022 (EP);
B31B2120/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGENDRUCKWALZE, ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/23] | English: | A COUNTER-PRESSURE ROLLER, AN ARRANGEMENT AND A METHOD THEREOF | [2022/23] | French: | ROULEAU DE CONTRE-PRESSION, AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 08.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3066063 (ECKLUND OSCAR F, et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,12,14,15 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-8 * [Y] 10 [I] 2,5-7,11,13; | [A]DE19815439 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [A] 1-15* column 7, line 61 - column 9, line 39; figures 1-11 *; | [YA]EP2143643 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0116]; figures 1-7 * [A] 1-9,11-15 |