EP4187292 - LIGHT-DRIVEN MICRODRONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius-Maximilians-Universität Würzburg Sanderring 2 97070 Würzburg / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecht, Bert 97299 Zell am Main / DE | 02 /
Wu, Xiaofei 97218 Gerbrunn / DE | 03 /
Ehehalt, Raphael 97834 Birkenfeld / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21210527.4 | 25.11.2021 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187292 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/10, G02B5/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G02B6/105 (EP);
G02B5/008 (EP);
B82Y15/00 (EP);
B82Y20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTGETRIEBENE MICRODROHNEN | [2023/22] | English: | LIGHT-DRIVEN MICRODRONES | [2023/22] | French: | MICRODRONES PHOTOCOMMANDÉS | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021159400 (RADOVANOVIC PAVLE [CA]) [A] 1-15; | [AD] - Tanaka Y Y ET AL, "Plasmonic linear nanomotor using lateral optical forces", Sci. Adv, (20201104), URL: https://www.science.org/doi/pdf/10.1126/sciadv.abc3726, (20211124), XP055865540 [AD] 1-15 | [A] - LIAW JIUNN-WOEI ET AL, "Spinning gold nanoparticles driven by circularly polarized light", JOURNAL OF QUANTITATIVE SPECTROSCOPY AND RADIATIVE TRANSFER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (20160202), vol. 175, doi:10.1016/J.JQSRT.2016.01.012, ISSN 0022-4073, pages 46 - 53, XP029458227 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jqsrt.2016.01.012 | [A] - LIAW JIUNN-WOEI ET AL, "Rotating Au nanorod and nanowire driven by circularly polarized light", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20141015), vol. 22, no. 21, doi:10.1364/OE.22.026005, page 26005, XP055925002 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.22.026005 | [A] - BUNEA ADA-IOANA ET AL, "Light-Powered Microrobots: Challenges and Opportunities for Hard and Soft Responsive Microswimmers", ADVANCED INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, DE, vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1002/aisy.202000256, ISSN 2640-4567, (20210222), page 2000256, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/aisy.202000256, XP055925020 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aisy.202000256 | [A] - YIFAT YUVAL ET AL, "Reactive optical matter: light-induced motility in electrodynamically asymmetric nanoscale scatterers", LIGHT: SCIENCE & APPLICATIONS, vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41377-018-0105-y, (20181201), URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/s41377-018-0105-y.pdf, XP055925187 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41377-018-0105-y | [A] - MILEKHIN ALEXANDER G ET AL, "Nanoantenna structures for the detection of phonons in nanocrystals", BEILSTEIN JOURNAL OF NANOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 9, no. 9, doi:10.3762/bjnano.9.246, (20181005), pages 2646 - 2656, URL: https://www.beilstein-journals.org/bjnano/content/pdf/2190-4286-9-246.pdf, XP055926833 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3762/bjnano.9.246 | [A] - AMEEN MOHAMED ET AL, "Infrared phononic nanoantennas: Localized surface phonon polaritons in SiC disks", CHINESE SCIENCE BULLETIN, CN, vol. 55, no. 24, doi:10.1007/s11434-010-4032-4, ISSN 1001-6538, (20100801), pages 2625 - 2628, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/s11434-010-4032-4.pdf, XP055926983 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11434-010-4032-4 | [A] - SCHULLER JON A. ET AL, "Optical antenna thermal emitters", NATURE PHOTONICS, London, vol. 3, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nphoton.2009.188, ISSN 1749-4885, (20091018), pages 658 - 661, URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/nphoton.2009.188, XP055927205 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2009.188 | [A] - WANG TAO ET AL, "Phonon-Polaritonic Bowtie Nanoantennas: Controlling Infrared Thermal Radiation at the Nanoscale", ACS PHOTONICS, vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acsphotonics.7b00321, ISSN 2330-4022, (20170615), pages 1753 - 1760, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acsphotonics.7b00321, XP055927207 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsphotonics.7b00321 | by applicant | - Y. Y. TANAKA et al., Science Advances, (20200000), vol. 6, page eabc3726 | - D. ANDREN et al., Nat. Nanotech, (20210000), vol. 16, pages 970 - 974 |