Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11879396 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2024 | B2 | US2023304443 | 28.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117168768 | 05.02.2021 | US202217992019 | 22.11.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4425019 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202117168768 | 05.02.2021 | EP21210755 | 26.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11549444 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2023 | B2 | US2022252013 | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117168768 | 05.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4039945 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | B1 | EP4039945 | 10.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117168768 | 05.02.2021 | Type | Divisional application |