EP4188050 - DETECTION AND EVALUATION OF PARAMETER VALES IN AN ELECTRONICS PRODUCTION LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blank, Rene 12249 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Borwieck, Carsten 14052 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Franke, Martin 14089 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Frühauf, Peter 14612 Falkensee / DE | 05 /
Heimann, Matthias 14469 Potsdam / DE | 06 /
Knofe, Rüdiger 14513 Teltow / DE | 07 /
Müller, Bernd 16259 Falkenberg / DE | 08 /
Nerreter, Stefan 15754 Heidesee OT Blossin / DE | 09 /
Wittreich, Ulrich 16727 Velten / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21211365.8 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188050 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/08 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H05K13/0882 (EP);
H05K13/083 (EP);
H05K13/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSEN UND AUSWERTEN VON PARAMETERWERTEN IN EINER ELEKTRONIKFERTIGUNGSLINIE | [2023/22] | English: | DETECTION AND EVALUATION OF PARAMETER VALES IN AN ELECTRONICS PRODUCTION LINE | [2023/22] | French: | DÉTECTION ET ÉVALUATION DES VALEURS DE PARAMÈTRE DANS UNE LIGNE DE PRODUCTION ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102019205812 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XAI]DE102020105185 (ASM ASSEMBLY SYS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |