EP4190605 - PNEUMOMECHANICAL TROLLEY FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klaipeda University H. Manto g. 84 92294 Klaipeda / LT | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Didziokas, Rimantas Klaipeda / LT | 02 /
Lukosius, Zydrunas Klaipeda distr. / LT | 03 /
Andziulis, Arunas Klaipeda distr. / LT | 04 /
Januteniene, Jolanta Klaipeda / LT | 05 /
Kurmis, Mindaugas Klaipeda distr. / LT | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Pakeniene, Ausra AAA Law A. Gostauto street 40B 03163 Vilnius / LT | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21211546.3 | 01.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190605 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4190605 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60G99/00 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B60G99/00 (EP);
B60G99/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | PNEUMOMECHANISCHER WAGEN FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2023/23] | English: | PNEUMOMECHANICAL TROLLEY FOR A CONTAINER | [2023/23] | French: | CHARIOT PNEUMOMÉCANIQUE POUR RÉCIPIENT | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2238872 (WRIGHT BARRY CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2005161916 (TAYLOR MICHAEL B [US]) [AD] 1-3* the whole document * | by applicant | US2005161916 | - S.SHELKEP.GOREG.JADHAVA.DOIPHODES. TEKWADE, "Compressed Air Generation Using Vehicle Suspension System", IJSRSET, (20180000), vol. 4, ISSN 2394-4099 | US20070766795 |