EP4008281 - SYSTEMS FOR TREATING RIB FRACTURES AND OSTEOTOMIES USING IMPLANTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globus Medical, Inc. Valley Forge Business Center 2560 General Armistead Avenue Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACOLLA, John West Chester, 19380 / US | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Morabito, Sara, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 21211591.9 | 01.12.2021 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | US202017112134 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: US202017112134 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008281 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80, A61B17/70 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/8076 (EP,US);
A61B17/1728 (US);
A61B17/1757 (EP);
A61B17/704 (EP);
A61B17/7041 (EP);
A61B17/7044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RIPPENFRAKTUREN UND OSTEOTOMIEN MITTELS IMPLANTATION | [2022/23] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR TREATING RIB FRACTURES AND OSTEOTOMIES USING IMPLANTATION | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT DE FRACTURE DE CÔTES ET D'OSTÉOTOMIES À L'AIDE D'IMPLANTATION | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 05.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014142638 (GOODWIN ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086]; figures 4, 6 *; | [A]US2017189088 (LIN LIE [CN]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figures 2,3 ** paragraph [0047]; figure 14 *; | [X]US2018325557 (SUDDABY LOUBERT S [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057]; figures 3-5 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068]; figures 6-8 * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084]; figures 18,19 *; | [XA]US2019380745 (HAMMANN CONRAD TYLER [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0040]; figures 7,8 * [A] 2,6,7,9 |