EP4023494 - FLAMMABLE FLUID DELIVERY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryolor Société Anonyme Pôle Industriel d'Ennery 57640 Argancy / FR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARRASSI, Lucien 57640 ARGANCY / FR | 02 /
GIBAUX, Etienne 57640 ARGANCY / FR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21212450.7 | 06.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | FR20210000014 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100014 | [2022/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023494 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4023494 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/22 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B60P3/2275 (EP);
B60P3/224 (EP,KR);
B60R16/0231 (CN);
B60P3/225 (US);
B60P3/2245 (US);
B60P3/2295 (US);
B60Q1/307 (KR);
B60R16/023 (KR);
B60R16/08 (KR);
B67D7/36 (CN);
F17C7/02 (US);
B60Y2200/146 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LIEFERFAHRZEUG FÜR BRENNBARE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2022/27] | English: | FLAMMABLE FLUID DELIVERY VEHICLE | [2022/27] | French: | VÉHICULE DE LIVRAISON DE FLUIDE INFLAMMABLE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 09.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 06.12.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | DK | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | EE | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | EE | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2156591 (DEV RESEARCH LTD) [A] 1-8 * page 1, lines 13-36 * * page 4, lines 2-31 * * page 4, line 31 - page 8, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2264271 (RUSTSUN LIMITED [IE]) [A] 1-8 * page 8, line 9 - page 12, line 25 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5263824 (WALDBESER FRED J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * claim 1 ** figures 1, 2 * |