EP4024353 - MEDIUM CONVEYANCE ROUTE SWITCHING DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED TELLER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYOSUNG TNS INC. (Suseo Bldg., Suseo-dong) 281, Gwangpyeong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06349 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Hyun Soo 06349 Seoul / KR | 02 /
OH, Hye Bin 06349 Seoul / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21212503.3 | 06.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | KR20200189022 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200189022 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024353 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/18, B65H29/58, G07D11/40 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G07D11/18 (EP,KR);
B65H29/60 (US);
B65H29/58 (EP,US);
B65H5/36 (US);
G07D11/13 (KR);
G07D11/40 (EP);
G07F19/20 (KR,US);
B65H2301/3125 (EP);
B65H2301/44822 (US);
B65H2403/942 (EP);
B65H2404/632 (EP);
B65H2404/7414 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMSCHALTUNG EINES MEDIENFÖRDERWEGS FÜR BANKAUTOMAT | [2022/27] | English: | MEDIUM CONVEYANCE ROUTE SWITCHING DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED TELLER MACHINE | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION DE TRAJET DE TRANSPORT DE SUPPORTS POUR GUICHET AUTOMATIQUE BANCAIRE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 09.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]KR20210081150 (HYOSUNG TNS INC [KR]) [XP] 1-5 * paragraphs [0047] , [ 0056] ** figures 1, 2, 6, 8, 9, 10 * | by applicant | KR101173806B |