EP4015248 - A PNEUMATIC TIRE WITH SEALANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 200 Innovation Way Akron, OH 44316 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFOIN, Jean-Claude Patrice Philippe L-9170 Mertzig / LU | 02 /
BRÜCKNER, Moritz D-63776 Mömbris / DE | 03 /
GOERL, Roman D-63785 Obernburg am Main / DE | 04 /
GUPTA, Sameer D-63450 Hanau / DE | 05 /
PIERRET, Kevin Erik M B-6640 Vaux-Sur-Sure / BE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/25] | Goodyear IP Law Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 21212521.5 | 06.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202063127671P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127671 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015248 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4015248 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/04, B60C11/11, B60C19/12, B60C19/00, B29D30/06, B60C11/03 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B60C11/04 (EP);
B60C19/002 (EP,CN,US);
B60C19/122 (EP,CN,US);
B29D30/06 (EP);
B29D30/0685 (EP);
B29D30/08 (CN);
B60C11/0306 (US);
B60C11/11 (EP);
B60C3/04 (US);
B60C9/22 (US);
B29D2030/0686 (EP);
B29D2030/0694 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN MIT DICHTMITTEL | [2022/25] | English: | A PNEUMATIC TIRE WITH SEALANT | [2022/25] | French: | PNEU DOTÉ D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016167455 (MAJUMDAR RAMENDRA NATH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102016212473 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12-14 * abstract *; | [E]WO2022069819 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [E] 1-11,15 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0143] * * figure - * | by applicant | US4895610 | US8360122 | US9802446 |