EP4023374 - HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tungaloy Corporation 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi, Iwaki-shi Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAWA, Shunsuke Fukushima, 9701144 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/27] | 01 /
MIYAZAWA, Syunsuke Fukushima, 9701144 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21212541.3 | 06.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | JP20210000529 | 05.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021000529 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023374 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/04, B23B27/08, B23B29/04 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B23B27/086 (EP);
B23B27/00 (CN);
B23B27/16 (US);
B23B27/04 (EP);
B23B27/1662 (CN);
B23B29/043 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTER | [2022/27] | English: | HOLDER | [2022/27] | French: | SUPPORT | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AT5887U (PLANSEE TIZIT AG [AT]); | [X]EP2082820 (PRAEZ S DREHTEILE LOECHER GMBH [DE]); | [IY]US2013156516 (HECHT GIL [IL]); | [IY]US2014050542 (ZEEB RUDI [DE], et al); | [I]US2018272431 (ATHAD SHIMON [IL]); | [XY]US2019240741 (HECHT GIL [IL], et al) | by applicant | JPH1110411 | JP2019526459 | JP2020104225 |