EP4191234 - METHOD OF ANALYSING A MIXED FLUORESCENCE RESPONSE OF A PLURALITY OF FLUOROPHORES, FLUORESCENCE ANALYSER, FLUORESCENCE MICROSCOPE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEISSLER, Benjamin 35510 Butzbach / DE | 02 /
SCHUMANN, Christian 35423 Lich / DE | 03 /
RITSCHEL, Kai 35452 Heuchelheim / DE | 04 /
BELJAN, Mate 61440 Oberursel / DE | 05 /
FOUQUET, Wernher 68167 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
COJOC, Gheorghe 01277 Dresden / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21212550.4 | 06.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191234 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01J3/44, G02B21/16 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP);
G01N21/64 (CN,US);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
G01N21/6428 (EP);
G01N2021/6441 (EP);
G01N2201/127 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE EINER GEMISCHTEN FLUORESZENZANTWORT MEHRERER FLUOROPHORE, FLUORESZENZANALYSATOR, FLUORESZENZMIKROSKOP UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD OF ANALYSING A MIXED FLUORESCENCE RESPONSE OF A PLURALITY OF FLUOROPHORES, FLUORESCENCE ANALYSER, FLUORESCENCE MICROSCOPE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'UNE RÉPONSE DE FLUORESCENCE MIXTE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE FLUOROPHORES, ANALYSEUR DE FLUORESCENCE, MICROSCOPE À FLUORESCENCE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 06.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6687000 (WHITE JOHN G [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]US2005243313 (NEHER ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-10,12-16 * [0001]-[0002], [0010], [0013], [0015], [0022], [0026]-[0027], [0048], [0051], [0054]-[0055];; figure 1 *; | [A]US2021208076 (CHANG JAE-BYUM [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * [0047]-[0048], [0062] *; | [X] - Mcrae Tristan D. ET AL, "Robust blind spectral unmixing for fluorescence microscopy using unsupervised learning", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/797993, (20191009), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/797993v1.full.pdf, (20220117), XP055879880 [X] 1-9,11-16 * figures 2-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/797993 | [A] - HUANG SHAOSEN ET AL, "Nonnegative matrix factorization using target-to-background contrast for fluorescence unmixing", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MEDICAL IMAGING PHYSICS AND ENGINEERING, IEEE, (20131019), doi:10.1109/ICMIPE.2013.6864553, pages 287 - 292, XP032625511 [A] 1-16 * Section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMIPE.2013.6864553 | [A] - MURAD MEGJHANI ET AL, "Morphologically constrained spectral unmixing by dictionary learning for multiplex fluorescence microscopy", BIOINFORMATICS, GB, (20170715), vol. 33, no. 14, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btx108, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 2182 - 2190, XP055589656 [A] 1-16 * Sections 2-3;; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btx108 | [A] - PU YANG ET AL, "Evaluation of algorithm methods for fluorescence spectra of cancerous and normal human tissues", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20160307), vol. 9703, doi:10.1117/12.2205628, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 97031M - 97031M, XP060065021 [A] 1-16 * Section 2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2205628 | [A] - JERILYN A. TIMLIN, "Imaging multiple endogenous and exogenous fluorescent species in cells and tissues", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING 2005, Visual Communications and Image Processing 2005, 2005, Beijing, China, (20060101), vol. 6088, doi:10.1117/12.647228, ISSN 0277-786X, page 608805, XP055013152 [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.647228 | [A] - JAMES R. MANSFIELD ET AL, "Autofluorescence removal, multiplexing, and automated analysis methods for in-vivo fluorescence imaging", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, 1000 20th St. Bellingham WA 98225-6705 USA, (20050101), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1117/1.2032458, ISSN 1083-3668, page 041207, XP055269855 [A] 1-16 * Section 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.2032458 | by applicant | EP3721279 | WO2021185557 | - T. ZIMMERMANN, "Spectral Imaging and Linear Unmixing in Light Microscopy", Adv. Biochem. Eng. Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 95, doi:10.1007/b102216, pages 245 - 265, XP055589696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/b102216 |