EP4195460 - ROTOR FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skougaard, Anders Vorm 7400 Herning / DK | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21212716.1 | 07.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195460 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27915 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H02K1/27915 (EP);
H02K1/278 (CN);
H02K1/2791 (CN,US);
F03D9/25 (US);
H02K1/28 (CN,US);
H02K15/03 (CN,US);
H02K15/12 (US);
H02K21/22 (US);
H02K7/183 (US);
F05D2220/76 (US);
H02K2213/03 (CN);
H02K2213/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE PERMANENTMAGNETISCHE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2023/24] | English: | ROTOR FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2023/24] | French: | ROTOR POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE À AIMANT PERMANENT | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS5622981U (JPO) [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * [Y] 10 [I] 4-9,11-13; | [Y]JP2010158130 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 10* figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2011091791 (LLOYD DYNAMOWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 14 * page 10, lines 1-18; figures 3,4 * * page 13, lines 5-17 * [I] 15; | [X]EP3340436 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; figures 1,9,10,22 *; | [A]CN110380535B (UNIV ZHEJIANG; SHANGHAI ELECTRIC WIND POWER GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1,5-7,10-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1903665 |