EP4194978 - MEASUREMENT ERROR REDUCTION IN A PROCESS BUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGARWAL, Abhishek 560034 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
FLEMMING, Stefan 90574 Roßtal-Buchschwabach / DE | 03 /
A.R., Anjana 560100 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 04 /
KOGAN, Igor 10719 Berlin / DE | 05 /
LIEDTKE, Christian 13591 Berlin / DE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21212848.2 | 07.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194978 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4194978 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G05B23/0267 (EP);
G05B2219/25061 (EP);
G05B2219/25068 (EP);
G05B2219/2609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MESSFEHLERVERRINGERUNG IN EINEM PROZESSBUSSYSTEM | [2023/24] | English: | MEASUREMENT ERROR REDUCTION IN A PROCESS BUS SYSTEM | [2023/24] | French: | RÉDUCTION DES ERREURS DE MESURE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE BUS DE PROCESSUS | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2014203138 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2014217186 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); |