EP4194825 - A WIRELESS LOGGER DEVICE AND A METHOD OF IMPROVING HEAT TRANSFER FROM SUCH A LOGGER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Controlant hf. Holtasmari 1 201 Kopavogur / IS | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJARTMARZ AGNAR, Thor 105 Reykjavik / IS | 02 /
HERMANSSON, Petur Gordon 210 Gardabaer / IS | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21212889.6 | 07.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194825 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4194825 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/022, G01D9/00, G01K1/024 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G01K1/022 (EP);
G01D9/007 (EP);
G01K1/024 (EP);
G01K2207/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE LOGGER-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES WÄRMETRANSFERS VON SOLCH EINER LOGGER-VORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | A WIRELESS LOGGER DEVICE AND A METHOD OF IMPROVING HEAT TRANSFER FROM SUCH A LOGGER DEVICE | [2023/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREUR SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR À PARTIR D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREUR | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 13.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | MC | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | LU | 07.12.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
IT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SK | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007227913 (SHOENFELD NORMAN A [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] *; | [A]CN107643815 (SHANDONG CHAOYUE NUMERICAL CONTROL ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0031] *; | [A]US2021025634 (ALEXANDER CLAYTON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] - [0083] * |