EP4194095 - A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR AND AN INTERFACE LEVEL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORGSTRÖM, Leonard SE-135 42 TYRESÖ / SE | 02 /
TÖRNBLOM, Olle SE-624 62 FÅRÖSUND / SE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 21213076.9 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194095 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B04B13/00, B04B1/08 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B04B13/00 (EP);
B04B1/08 (EP);
B04B1/10 (EP);
B04B2013/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALABSCHEIDER UND SCHNITTSTELLENPEGELSENSOR | [2023/24] | English: | A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR AND AN INTERFACE LEVEL SENSOR | [2023/24] | French: | SÉPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE ET CAPTEUR DE NIVEAU D'INTERFACE | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3986663 (JONSSON ROLF A, et al); | [XI]WO9619292 (ESSO NORGE A S [NO], et al); | [A]EP3782735 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) | by applicant | US3189268 | WO2021032353 |