EP4012620 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY LEARNING BY TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDDIK, Mohamed El Amine 91120 Palaiseau / FR | 02 /
TAMAAZOUSTI, Mohamed 91191 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21213450.6 | 09.12.2021 | [2022/24] | Priority number, date | FR20200013155 | 14.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2013155 | [2022/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012620 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHES LERNEN DURCH ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY LEARNING BY TRANSFER | [2022/24] | French: | MÉTHODE D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE PAR TRANSFERT | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019311258 (ZHANG LEI [US], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0112] * [I] 2-9; | [A]US2020134469 (CHOO JIN HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A] - XUHONG LI ET AL, "Explicit Inductive Bias for Transfer Learning with Convolutional Networks", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180205), XP081235499 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 4, column 2, line 24 - page 7, column 2, line 22 * |