EP3986066 - METHOD FOR UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2024/07] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenhong Wusha, Chang'an, Dongguan 523860 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Zhihua Wusha, Chang'an, Dongguan 523860 / CN | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21213869.7 | 28.12.2017 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986066 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3986066 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0456 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,KR,RU,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0404 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04B7/0691 (EP);
H04L5/005 (EP,RU);
H04L5/0051 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W52/08 (EP,KR,RU);
H04W52/10 (EP,KR);
H04W52/242 (EP,KR);
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UPLINK-DATENÜBERTRAGUNG, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/16] | English: | METHOD FOR UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES MONTANTES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 12.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17935941.9 / EP3629647 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 28.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 |