Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11142529 | ![]() | 12.10.2021 | B2 | US2019284196 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201916428394 | 31.05.2019 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | US201615104494 | 14.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10329301 | ![]() | 25.06.2019 | B2 | US2017253603 | 07.09.2017 | A2 | US2017022208 | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201415104494 | 19.12.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6883988B | ![]() | 09.06.2021 | B2 | JP2017500334 | 05.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL246261 | ![]() | 25.03.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3083569 | ![]() | 26.01.2022 | B1 | EP3083569 | 04.10.2017 | A4 | EP3083569 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112409363B | ![]() | 14.11.2023 | B | CN112409363 | 26.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | CN201480073611 | 19.12.2014 | CN202010983158 | 19.12.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106068256B | ![]() | 23.10.2020 | B | CN106068256 | 30.10.2018 | A8 | CN106068256 | 02.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3123897 | ![]() | 06.02.2024 | C | CA3123897 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | CA2934553 | 19.12.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2934553 | ![]() | 31.10.2023 | C | CA2934553 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014368961B | ![]() | 17.10.2019 | B2 | AU2014368961 | 10.11.2016 | A2 | AU2014368961 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4032889 | ![]() | 27.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | EP14870710 | 19.12.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016014564 | 08.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA039381 | 20.01.2022 | B1 | EA201691290 | 30.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX381561 | 12.03.2025 | B | MX2016007808 | 07.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX391314 | 21.03.2025 | B | MX2019010577 | 21.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ722077 | 24.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ760341 | 24.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | NZ72207714 | 19.12.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201605027 | 26.04.2023 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | WO2014US71644 | 19.12.2014 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015095783 | ![]() | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021080287 | ![]() | 27.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020011998 | ![]() | 23.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361919394 | 20.12.2013 | US201462075743 | 05.11.2014 | US201361919390 | 20.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | EP3083569 |