Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
01.05.2024 | Deletion: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
01.05.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
30.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
30.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
07.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
21.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.03.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
03.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
14.10.2022 | Change - applicant | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
05.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
05.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
03.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.12.2021 | Change - representative |